WA HB1128 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning housing benefit districts.
Title
Concerning housing benefit districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-29 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2021-01-29 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-01-29 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2021-01-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
GOVERNOR
HOMES AND HOUSING
MINORITIES
STATE AGENCIES AND DEPARTMENTS
TAXES - PROPERTY
TAXES - SALES
TAXES - USE
HOMES AND HOUSING
MINORITIES
STATE AGENCIES AND DEPARTMENTS
TAXES - PROPERTY
TAXES - SALES
TAXES - USE
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29a | 36 | 210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
36 | 70a | 600 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 14 | 410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
84 | 52 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |