WA HB1135 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-01 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning actions for wrongful injury or death.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning actions for wrongful injury or death.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-28HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-28HouseAPP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Civil Rights & Judiciary.
2019-02-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-05HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-01HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-01HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-01HouseCRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-01HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
2019-01-23HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.

Same As/Similar To

SB5163 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-26 - Effective date 7/28/2019.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback