WA HB1137 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning national guard pay in state active service for wildland fire response duty.
Title
Concerning national guard pay in state active service for wildland fire response duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-19 | House | Chapter 66, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-16 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:30 AM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2019-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-20 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-01-29 | House | HOUS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5196 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.