WA HB1143 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring notification of the discharge or use of firefighting foam containing certain chemicals.
Title
Requiring notification of the discharge or use of firefighting foam containing certain chemicals.
Sponsors
Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-12 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-12 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-12 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-07 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |