WA HB1149 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying requirements to obtain a sexual assault protection order.
Title
Clarifying requirements to obtain a sexual assault protection order.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-07 | House | Chapter 258, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-02-20 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 81; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-02-20 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-15 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-01 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |