WA HB1150 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning compliance requirements of the revised uniform fiduciary access to digital assets act.
Title
Concerning compliance requirements of the revised uniform fiduciary access to digital assets act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-01 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-01 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1150&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1150.pdf |