WA HB1154 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the financing of Chehalis basin flood damage reduction and habitat restoration projects.
Title
Concerning the financing of Chehalis basin flood damage reduction and habitat restoration projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-31 | House | Chapter 221, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate receded from amendments. |
2020-03-11 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-16 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-10 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |