WA HB1158 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Regulating permanent cosmetics under the Washington body art, body piercing, and tattooing act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulating permanent cosmetics under the Washington body art, body piercing, and tattooing act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-04-28SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-03-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Labor & Commerce.
2019-03-11HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 64; nays, 33; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-11HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-11House1st substitute bill substituted
2019-03-01HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-01-30HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-01-30HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-01-30HouseCPB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-01-30HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-16HouseFirst reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback