WA HB1166 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Effective date 4/23/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Effective date 4/23/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting sexual assault survivors.
Title
Supporting sexual assault survivors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Effective date 4/23/2019*. |
2019-04-23 | House | Chapter 93, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-17 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-06 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-01-31 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |