WA HB1167 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the protection of composting from nuisance lawsuits.
Title
Concerning the protection of composting from nuisance lawsuits.
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] |
Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] |
Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-06 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-06 | House | RDAN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5476 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1167&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1167.pdf |