WA HB1168 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating sales and use and excise tax exemptions for self-help housing development.
Title
Creating sales and use and excise tax exemptions for self-help housing development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | HSA - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
2019-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-25 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |