WA HB1171 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing trust institutions.
Title
Addressing trust institutions.
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Steve Kirby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-01-23 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-01-23 | House | CPB - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5107 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1171&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1171.pdf |