WA HB1188 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning rangeland fire protection associations.
Title
Concerning rangeland fire protection associations.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Joe Schmick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-28 | House | Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-15 | House | RDAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |