WA HB1195 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 5/21/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 5/21/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the efficient administration of campaign finance and public disclosure reporting and enforcement.
Title
Concerning the efficient administration of campaign finance and public disclosure reporting and enforcement.
Sponsors
Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] | Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Effective date 5/21/2019*. |
2019-05-21 | House | Chapter 428, 2019 Laws PV. |
2019-05-21 | House | Governor partially vetoed. |
2019-04-28 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 92; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-26 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate receded from amendments. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Held on third reading. |
2019-04-23 | House | Conference committee appointed. Representatives Gregerson, Hudgins, Walsh. |
2019-04-23 | House | House refuses to concur in the Senate amendments. Asks Senate for Conference thereon. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2019-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-07 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-22 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5112 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.