WA HB1201 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the Washington national guard postsecondary education grant program.
Title
Concerning the Washington national guard postsecondary education grant program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-29 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-03 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-01 | House | HOUS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5197 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.