WA HB1207 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning manufactured housing communities.
Title
Concerning manufactured housing communities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | HSA - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
2019-03-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-05 | House | HOUS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |