WA HB1209 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing prepaid postage for all election ballots.
Title
Providing prepaid postage for all election ballots.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-08 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5063 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/1/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1209&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1209.pdf |