WA HB1219 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing cities and counties authority to use real estate excise taxes to support affordable housing and homelessness projects.
Title
Providing cities and counties authority to use real estate excise taxes to support affordable housing and homelessness projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-19 | House | Chapter 73, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-19 | House | Governor partially vetoed. |
2019-04-16 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | HSA - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
2019-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 74; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-02-15 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-05 | House | HOUS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5195 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.