WA HB1219 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the appointment of counsel for youth in dependency court proceedings.
Title
Concerning the appointment of counsel for youth in dependency court proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-10 | House | Chapter 210, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-10 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 84; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2021-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 85; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-02 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-18 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-18 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-18 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2021-02-09 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-09 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-09 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
Subjects
ATTORNEYS
CHILDREN
CIVIL LEGAL AID, OFFICE
COURTS
DOMESTIC RELATIONS
FOSTER CARE
JUVENILES AND JUVENILE COURT
PUBLIC ASSISTANCE
CHILDREN
CIVIL LEGAL AID, OFFICE
COURTS
DOMESTIC RELATIONS
FOSTER CARE
JUVENILES AND JUVENILE COURT
PUBLIC ASSISTANCE
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 34 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 34 | 092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 34 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 53 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
2 | 53 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |