WA HB1222 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning public utility districts' contracts for work or materials.
Title
Concerning public utility districts' contracts for work or materials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-06 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5191 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.