WA HB1223 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning diaper changing stations at restaurants.
Title
Concerning diaper changing stations at restaurants.
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. My-Linh Thai [D] | Rep. Zack Hudgins [D] | Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] |
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] |
Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-02-15 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-05 | House | CPB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5156 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.