WA HB1225 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing policies and requirements regarding law enforcement response to domestic violence incidents to enhance the safety of domestic violence victims, families, and officers.
Title
Establishing policies and requirements regarding law enforcement response to domestic violence incidents to enhance the safety of domestic violence victims, families, and officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-13 | House | Chapter 367, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 55; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-15 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-01 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-01 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-01 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |