WA HB1237 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Reforming the compliance and enforcement provisions for marijuana licensees.
Title
Reforming the compliance and enforcement provisions for marijuana licensees.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Sen. Drew MacEwen [R] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] |
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-21 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-21 | House | COG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5318 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.