WA HB1239 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting the confidentiality of health care quality and peer review discussions to support effective patient safety.
Title
Protecting the confidentiality of health care quality and peer review discussions to support effective patient safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Joe Schmick [R] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] |
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. My-Linh Thai [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Kelly Chambers [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-29 | House | Chapter 162, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-29 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2019-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-07 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-06 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |