WA HB1242 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the authorization to impose special excise taxes on the sale of lodging.
Title
Concerning the authorization to impose special excise taxes on the sale of lodging.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-26 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5228 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.