WA HB1255 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating Patches pal special license plates.
Title
Creating Patches pal special license plates.
Sponsors
Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Rep. Jeremie Dufault [R] | Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 88; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 6. |
2019-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-15 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-06 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |