WA HB1257 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning energy efficiency.
Title
Concerning energy efficiency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 55 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 25 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 25 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-07 | House | Chapter 285, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 55; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 6. |
2019-03-29 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-29 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-29 | House | 3rd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-25 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-03-18 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-18 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-18 | House | APP - Majority; 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-03-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-28 | House | Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-27 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-27 | House | FIN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2019-02-14 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-14 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-14 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-07 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5293 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.