WA HB1279 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating the joint legislative oversight committee on trade policy.
Title
Eliminating the joint legislative oversight committee on trade policy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | FIET - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:30 AM. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade. |
2019-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-15 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-12 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-06 | House | ITED - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 9:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development. |