WA HB1292 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning deadlines for receipt of voter registrations by election officials.
Title
Concerning deadlines for receipt of voter registrations by election officials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-19 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5227 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.