WA HB1300 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House College & Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House College & Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the reinvesting in our colleges program.
Title
Creating the reinvesting in our colleges program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-08 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 8:30 AM. |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1300&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1300.pdf |