WA HB1326 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Collecting DNA samples.
Title
Collecting DNA samples.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-21 | House | Chapter 443, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-28 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-28 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Senate receded from amendments. |
2019-04-19 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-06 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-14 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |