WA HB1331 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-5)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning opioid use disorder treatment, prevention, and related services.
Title
Concerning opioid use disorder treatment, prevention, and related services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-08 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5380 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019*.