WA HB1336 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding career connected learning opportunities.
Title
Expanding career connected learning opportunities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-13 | House | CWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-08 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 8:30 AM. |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-29 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5327 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.