WA HB1341 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of unmanned aerial systems near certain protected marine species.
Title
Concerning the use of unmanned aerial systems near certain protected marine species.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2019-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 67; nays, 26; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2019-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-15 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-05 | House | ITED - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-01 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development. |