WA HB1347 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning vehicle reseller permits.
Title
Concerning vehicle reseller permits.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] | Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. Mike Volz [R] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] |
Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | House | Chapter 11, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-07 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |