WA HB1359 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning local government procurement modernization and efficiency.
Title
Concerning local government procurement modernization and efficiency.
Sponsors
Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] |
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5418 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.