WA HB1360 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning abstracts of driving records.
Title
Concerning abstracts of driving records.
Sponsors
Rep. Morgan Irwin [R] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-23 | House | Chapter 99, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-17 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-21 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-21 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5725 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.