WA HB1366 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Removing disincentives to the creation of community facilities districts.
Title
Removing disincentives to the creation of community facilities districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Sullivan [D] | Rep. William Jenkin [R] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Debra Entenman [D] |
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 78 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-07 | House | Chapter 260, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 78; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 8. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2019-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 80; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-06 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |