WA HB1376 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning faith-based exemptions regarding criminal mistreatment of children and vulnerable adults.
Title
Concerning faith-based exemptions regarding criminal mistreatment of children and vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Rep. Bradley Klippert [R] | Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] |
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5749 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1376&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1376.pdf |