WA HB1383 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the crime of patronizing a prostitute.
Title
Modifying the crime of patronizing a prostitute.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-06 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-14 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |