WA HB1395 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning direct contractor liability for payment of wages and benefits.
Title
Concerning direct contractor liability for payment of wages and benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-04 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5565 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-16 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.