WA HB1399 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning paid family and medical leave.
Title
Concerning paid family and medical leave.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-03 | House | Chapter 13, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-01 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-03-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 40; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2019-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 71; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-18 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-18 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-18 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Appropriations. |
2019-02-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-01-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-01-28 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-24 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5449 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.