WA HB1406 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging investments in affordable and supportive housing.
Title
Encouraging investments in affordable and supportive housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-28 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-09 | House | Chapter 338, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-09 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-28 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-28 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 62; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-28 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | HSA - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
2019-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 66; nays, 32; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-05 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-25 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-25 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |
2019-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2019-02-06 | House | HOUS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5646 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.