WA HB1411 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Commerce & Gaming Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Commerce & Gaming Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modernizing resident distillery marketing and sales restrictions.
Title
Modernizing resident distillery marketing and sales restrictions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-21 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5549 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1411&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1411.pdf |