WA HB1416 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning liquor licensees' promotion of retailers' events, including licensed events and other events and activities at retail locations.
Title
Concerning liquor licensees' promotion of retailers' events, including licensed events and other events and activities at retail locations.
Sponsors
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. William Jenkin [R] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] |
Rep. Monica Stonier [D] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-04 | House | COG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |