WA HB1422 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the protection of vulnerable adults.
Title
Concerning the protection of vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-20 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2020-01-20 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-01-20 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-01-20 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-01-20 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-01-14 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-08 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5338 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-22 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM.