WA HB1426 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning cooperation between conservation districts.
Title
Concerning cooperation between conservation districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Ramos [D] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Jared Mead [D] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] |
Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] | Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-23 | House | Chapter 103, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-17 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2019-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-13 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5585 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - Senate Rules "X" file.