WA HB1428 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the disclosure of attributes of electricity products.
Title
Concerning the disclosure of attributes of electricity products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-30 | House | Chapter 222, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2019-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-14 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-02-14 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-01-31 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |