WA HB1434 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminating the use of the valid court order exception to place youth in detention for noncriminal behavior.
Title
Eliminating the use of the valid court order exception to place youth in detention for noncriminal behavior.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-08 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-06 | House | HSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5290 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/1/2019*.