WA HB1437 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing noncollection of taxes by county treasurers.
Title
Addressing noncollection of taxes by county treasurers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-06 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5132 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1437&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1437.pdf |